There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Smart Building Acceleration Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To accelerate smart building development, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
05/16/2019Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy
05/16/2019Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy
04/10/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy
04/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
04/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 06/04/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 06/12/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/03/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy04/04/2019 Referred to
04/10/2019 Hearings by
05/16/2019 Markup by
05/16/2019 Reported by
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/03/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management04/04/2019 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology04/03/2019 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Energy04/03/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.