There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Pink Tax Repeal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the pricing of consumer products and services that are substantially similar if such products or services are priced differently based on the gender of the individuals for whose use the products are intended or marketed or for whom the services are performed or offered.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/03/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 04/03/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/03/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 04/03/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 04/04/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 04/29/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 05/07/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/30/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 06/03/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/10/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 06/11/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/03/2019 Referred to

As of 06/19/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2048 - Pink Tax Repeal Act.


Subjects (0)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.