There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting and Securing Florida's Coastline Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

Protecting and Securing Florida's Coastline Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting and Securing Florida's Coastline Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Gulf of Mexico Energy Security Act of 2006 to permanently extend the moratorium on leasing in certain areas of the Gulf of Mexico.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/11/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 248 - 180 (Roll no. 521).
07/16/2019Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-156.
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (30)

Date Chamber
09/12/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
09/11/2019-4:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/11/2019-4:47pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 248 - 180 (Roll no. 521).
09/11/2019-4:37pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
09/11/2019-4:35pmHouseThe House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 205.
09/11/2019-4:34pmHouseH.Amdt.616 On agreeing to the Gosar amendment (A003) as modified Failed by recorded vote: 182 - 251 (Roll no. 520).
09/11/2019-3:56pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 548, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Gosar amendment No. 3, as modified.
09/11/2019-3:55pmHouseH.Amdt.616 Gosar amendment (A003) modified by unanimous consent. (text as modified: CR H7632)
09/11/2019-3:55pmHouseH.Amdt.616 Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Gosar. (consideration: CR H7632-7633; text: CR H7632)
09/11/2019-3:54pmHouseH.Amdt.615 On agreeing to the Barragan amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
09/11/2019-3:51pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 548, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Barragan amendment No. 2.
09/11/2019-3:50pmHouseH.Amdt.615 Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Barragan. (consideration: CR H7631-7632; text: CR H7631)
09/11/2019-3:50pmHouseH.Amdt.614 On agreeing to the Crist amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
09/11/2019-3:43pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 548, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Crist amendment No. 1.
09/11/2019-3:42pmHouseH.Amdt.614 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Crist. (consideration: CR H7630-7631; text: CR H7630)
09/11/2019-2:44pmHouseGENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 205.
09/11/2019-2:43pmHouseThe Speaker designated the Honorable Al Lawson, Jr. to act as Chairman of the Committee.
09/11/2019-2:43pmHouseHouse resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 548 and Rule XVIII.
09/11/2019-2:42pmHouseProviding for consideration of H.R. 205, H.R. 1146, and H.R. 1941.
09/11/2019-2:42pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 548. (consideration: CR H7622-7634; text: CR H7630)
09/09/2019-7:26pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 548 Reported to House. Providing for consideration of H.R. 205, H.R. 1146, and H.R. 1941.
07/16/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 116.
07/16/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-156.
06/19/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 12.
06/19/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/19/2019HouseSubcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
04/02/2019HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
02/05/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/03/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/03/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/03/2019 Referred to
06/19/2019 Markup by
07/16/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-156
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources02/05/2019 Referred to
04/02/2019 Hearings by
06/19/2019 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/12/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.205. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (07/16/2019)

Protecting and Securing Florida's Coastline Act of 2019

This bill permanently extends the moratorium on oil and gas leasing, preleasing, and related activities in certain areas of the Gulf of Mexico.