There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Sustainable Chemistry Research and Development Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

Sustainable Chemistry Research and Development Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Sustainable Chemistry Research and Development Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for Federal coordination of activities supporting sustainable chemistry, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
12/09/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9359-9361)
11/26/2019Committee on the Budget discharged.
11/26/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-312, Part I.
04/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
12/10/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
12/09/2019-3:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/09/2019-3:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9359-9361)
12/09/2019-3:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2051.
12/09/2019-3:23pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9359-9362)
12/09/2019-3:23pmHouseMs. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/26/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 253.
11/26/2019HouseCommittee on the Budget discharged.
11/26/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-312, Part I.
10/17/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
10/17/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
04/03/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/03/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/03/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology04/03/2019 Referred to
10/17/2019 Markup by
11/26/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-312
House Budget04/03/2019 Referred to
11/26/2019 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/10/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2051. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/03/2019)

Sustainable Chemistry Research and Development Act of 2019

This bill directs the Office of Science and Technology Policy to convene an interagency entity under the National Science and Technology Council with the responsibility of coordinating federal programs and activities in support of sustainable chemistry.