There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To recognize and honor the service of individuals who served in the United States Cadet Nurse Corps during World War II, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
04/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
04/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 04/03/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/08/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 04/08/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 04/12/2019
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 04/15/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/29/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/29/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 04/29/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 04/29/2019
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1] 05/03/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 05/03/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 05/03/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/03/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 05/03/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 05/14/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/14/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 05/14/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 05/14/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/14/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/20/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 06/12/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 06/12/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/12/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/12/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 06/12/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 06/13/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 06/18/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/18/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/18/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/25/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 06/25/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/02/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 07/05/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/15/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/15/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/15/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 07/19/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/25/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 07/25/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 07/30/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/03/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services04/03/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel04/04/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.