There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

DHS Intelligence Rotational Assignment Program Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

DHS Intelligence Rotational Assignment Program Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

DHS Intelligence Rotational Assignment Program Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish the Intelligence Rotational Assignment Program in the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/01/2020Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-228.
05/14/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3762)
04/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/01/2020SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 459.
06/01/2020SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-228.
11/06/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/15/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
05/14/2019-4:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/14/2019-4:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3762)
05/14/2019-4:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2066.
05/14/2019-4:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3762-3763)
05/14/2019-4:51pmHouseMs. Torres Small (NM) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/23/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
04/03/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
04/03/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 05/14/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security04/03/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism04/23/2019 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/15/2019 Referred to
11/06/2019 Markup by
06/01/2020 Reported by S. Rept. 116-228

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2066. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (06/01/2020)

DHS Intelligence Rotational Assignment Program Act of 2019

This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to establish an Intelligence Rotational Assignment Program.

DHS's Chief Human Capital Officer, in conjunction with the Chief Intelligence Officer, shall administer the program, which shall be open to employees serving in analyst positions in an intelligence component of DHS, analyst positions in the U.S. Secret Service, and other DHS positions as deemed appropriate by the Secretary.

The responsibilities relating to the Homeland Security Rotation Program shall be carried out by the Chief Human Capital Officer.