There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Gluten in Medicine Disclosure Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to require the label of a drug that is intended for human use and contains an ingredient that is derived directly or indirectly from a gluten-containing grain to identify each such ingredient, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/03/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 04/03/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/09/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 04/09/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/09/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/25/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 04/25/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 04/25/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/25/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/02/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/02/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/03/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/09/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/09/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/09/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 05/09/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/17/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/17/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/17/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 05/20/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/20/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/20/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 05/28/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/28/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 05/28/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 06/12/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/18/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/26/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 07/26/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/26/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 08/09/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 08/09/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 08/09/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 08/16/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 08/20/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 09/06/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 09/06/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 09/10/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 09/10/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 09/24/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/04/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 10/11/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 10/16/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/01/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 11/19/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 12/05/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/10/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 01/08/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 01/24/2020
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 02/05/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/26/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 05/15/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/26/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 09/14/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce04/03/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/04/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (0)

With the start of a new Congress, summaries from prior Congresses may be delayed or abbreviated.