There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

School-Based Health Centers Reauthorization Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

School-Based Health Centers Reauthorization Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

School-Based Health Centers Reauthorization Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize school-based health centers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/29/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/24/2020Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-532.
04/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/30/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
09/29/2020-3:25pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/29/2020-3:25pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5008-5009)
09/29/2020-3:17pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2075.
09/29/2020-3:17pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5008-5010)
09/29/2020-3:17pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/24/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 432.
09/24/2020HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-532.
09/09/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/09/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/04/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/03/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
04/03/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (83)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 04/08/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 04/08/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/10/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 04/10/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/10/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 04/10/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/10/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 04/10/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 04/10/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 04/10/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/10/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 04/18/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/18/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 04/18/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 04/18/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 04/30/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/30/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/30/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/30/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 04/30/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 04/30/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/16/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 05/16/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 05/16/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/04/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 06/04/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 06/04/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 06/04/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 06/25/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/25/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/25/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 06/25/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 06/26/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/26/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/26/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 06/27/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 06/27/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/27/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/02/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 07/02/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/02/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/02/2019
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/02/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 07/02/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/02/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 07/11/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/11/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/11/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/17/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/17/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 07/17/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/23/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 07/23/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 07/23/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 07/23/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 07/23/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/23/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 07/23/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 08/16/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 08/16/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 08/16/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 08/16/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/16/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 08/16/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 08/16/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 08/16/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/24/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 10/31/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 11/14/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/15/2020
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 02/27/2020
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/02/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/18/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/29/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 07/29/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 07/30/2020
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 08/07/2020
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 09/01/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/11/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/11/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce04/03/2019 Referred to
09/09/2020 Markup by
09/24/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-532
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/04/2019 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/30/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2075. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/29/2020)

School-Based Health Centers Reauthorization Act of 2020

This bill reauthorizes through FY2025 the School-based Health Centers program and removes specified limitations on the receipt of additional or multiple funds under the program.