There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Access to Contraception for Servicemembers and Dependents Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to ensure that members of the Armed Forces and their families have access to the contraception they need in order to promote the health and readiness of all members of the Armed Forces, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/04/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/05/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
04/04/2019Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/04/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/04/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 04/04/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/04/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 04/04/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/04/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/08/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 04/08/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/08/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/08/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/09/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/12/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/12/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 04/12/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/18/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 04/18/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/18/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/25/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/25/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 04/25/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 04/29/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 04/30/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 05/01/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 05/01/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/01/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 05/15/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/15/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/16/2019
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 05/21/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/22/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services04/04/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel04/05/2019 Referred to

As of 05/26/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2091 - Access to Contraception for Servicemembers and Dependents Act of 2019.


Subjects (0)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.