There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

STATES Act
Strengthening the Tenth Amendment Through Entrusting States Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Controlled Substances Act to provide for a new rule regarding the application of the Act to marihuana, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/04/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
05/15/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/05/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/05/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/04/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/04/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/04/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/04/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 04/04/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/04/2019
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 04/04/2019
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 04/08/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/08/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/12/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 04/12/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/29/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 04/29/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 04/29/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 04/29/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 04/29/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/29/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 04/29/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 04/29/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 04/29/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/29/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/09/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 05/09/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/09/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 05/09/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/15/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/15/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/15/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/15/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/04/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/04/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 06/04/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 06/04/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/04/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/13/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/13/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 06/13/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 06/13/2019
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 07/16/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/17/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/17/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/22/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/17/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 09/17/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/29/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/04/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security05/15/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce04/04/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/05/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/04/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit04/05/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2093. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/04/2019)

Strengthening the Tenth Amendment Through Entrusting States Act or the STATES Act

This bill eliminates regulatory controls and administrative, civil, and criminal penalties under the Controlled Substances Act for certain marijuana-related activities that comply with state or tribal law.

The bill also requires the Government Accountability Office to study and report on the effects of marijuana legalization on traffic safety.