There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

BRAVE Act
Boosting Rates of American Veteran Employment Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

BRAVE Act
Boosting Rates of American Veteran Employment Act

Short Titles as Introduced

BRAVE Act
Boosting Rates of American Veteran Employment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, in awarding a contract for the procurement of goods or services, to give a preference to offerors that employ veterans.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/24/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5045)
06/18/2019Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-117.
04/04/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
06/25/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/24/2019-3:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5045)
06/24/2019-3:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/24/2019-3:02pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2109.
06/24/2019-3:02pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5045-5046)
06/24/2019-3:01pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/18/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 86.
06/18/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-117.
05/01/2019HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
05/01/2019HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
04/29/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/04/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/04/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/04/2019 Referred to
06/18/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-117
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity04/29/2019 Referred to
05/01/2019 Markup by
05/01/2019 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs06/25/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2109. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (06/24/2019)

Boosting Rates of American Veteran Employment Act or the BRAVE Act

This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), in awarding a contract for the procurement of goods or services, to give preference to offerors based on the percentage of the offeror's full-time employees who are veterans.

The VA is also authorized to debar from VA contracting for at least five years any offeror determined to have willfully and intentionally misrepresented the veteran status of its employees. Such debarment shall include the debarment of all principals in the offeror for at least five years.