There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Public Disclosure of Drug Discounts and Real-Time Beneficiary Drug Cost Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Public Disclosure of Drug Discounts Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend titles XI and XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide greater transparency for discounts provided by manufacturers, to include real-time benefit information as part of a prescription drug plan's electronic prescription program under the Medicare program, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XI of the Social Security Act to provide greater transparency of discounts provided by drug manufacturers.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/28/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 0 (Roll no. 586).(text: CR H8516)
04/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/29/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
10/28/2019-7:18pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
10/28/2019-7:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/28/2019-7:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 0 (Roll no. 586). (text: CR H8516)
10/28/2019-7:09pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8520-8521)
10/28/2019-6:40pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
10/28/2019-6:19pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2115.
10/28/2019-6:19pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8516-8519)
10/28/2019-6:19pmHouseMs. Schakowsky moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/21/2019HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
04/09/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/08/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/08/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/08/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/08/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 04/08/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 04/08/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 05/01/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 10/28/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 10/28/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/08/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/09/2019 Referred to
05/21/2019 Hearings by
House Ways and Means04/08/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health04/08/2019 Referred to
Senate Finance10/29/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2115. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (10/28/2019)

Public Disclosure of Drug Discounts and Real-Time Beneficiary Drug Cost Act

This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to publish certain payment information regarding pharmacy benefit managers (PBMs) and prescription drugs. Specifically, the CMS must publish certain information, as reported by PBMs, relating to generic dispensing rates, drug discounts and rebates, and payments between PBMs, health plans, and pharmacies, in accordance with specified confidentiality requirements.

The bill also provides statutory authority for certain provisions of the CMS rule titled "Modernizing Part D and Medicare Advantage to Lower Drug Prices and Reduce Out-of-Pocket Expenses," published on May 23, 2019. The rule requires, in part, Medicare prescription drug plan sponsors to implement an electronic, real-time benefit tool that is capable of integrating with at least one prescriber's electronic prescribing system or electronic health record. The tool must provide prescribers with patient-specific, real-time formulary and benefit information, including information regarding cost-sharing, formulary alternatives, and utilization management requirements. The rule takes effect January 1, 2021.