There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

FASTER Act of 2019
Food Allergy Safety, Treatment, Education, and Research Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve the health and safety of Americans living with food allergies and related disorders, including potentially life-threatening anaphylaxis, food protein-induced enterocolitis syndrome, and eosinophilic gastrointestinal diseases, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
07/15/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/15/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/11/2020Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
03/11/2020Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
04/09/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/08/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (92)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 04/12/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 04/25/2019
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/30/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 04/30/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/08/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/14/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/14/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/17/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 05/21/2019
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2] 05/21/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/05/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/12/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/18/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 07/09/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 07/09/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 08/02/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 08/23/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 08/23/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 08/23/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 08/30/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 08/30/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 08/30/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 08/30/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 09/06/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 09/06/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/06/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 09/10/2019
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6] 09/11/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 09/18/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 10/04/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/11/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 10/16/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 10/28/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/29/2019
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1] 10/30/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 10/31/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/19/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 12/03/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/04/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 12/05/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 12/06/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 12/12/2019
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1] 12/12/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 12/13/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/17/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/19/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 12/19/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/19/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 01/13/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 01/16/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/24/2020
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 01/28/2020
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/28/2020
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/29/2020
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 01/29/2020
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 01/29/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 01/30/2020
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 02/04/2020
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 02/04/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 02/05/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/05/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 02/06/2020
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 02/11/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 02/12/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/12/2020
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 02/12/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 02/13/2020
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 02/14/2020
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 02/25/2020
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/25/2020
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/28/2020
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 02/28/2020
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/28/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 03/02/2020
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 03/02/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 03/04/2020
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/04/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 03/04/2020
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/04/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 03/04/2020
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/04/2020
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 03/13/2020
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 03/13/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 03/13/2020
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 03/13/2020
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 03/13/2020
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/13/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 05/15/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/15/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/22/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 05/28/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/16/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/08/2019 Referred to
07/15/2020 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/09/2019 Referred to
03/11/2020 Markup by
03/11/2020 Reported by

As of 10/31/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2117 - FASTER Act of 2019


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2117. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/08/2019)

Food Allergy Safety, Treatment, Education, and Research Act of 2019 or the FASTER Act of 2019

This bill directs the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention to expand data collection of information related to food allergies and specific allergens and revises the definition of major allergen to specifically include sesame. The Department of Health and Human Services may designate additional food ingredients as major allergens based on the prevalence and severity of allergic reactions through regulation.

The Food and Drug Administration and the National Institutes of Health must report on specified information regarding food allergies.