There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Exposing the Financing of Human Trafficking Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Trafficking Victims Protection Act of 2000 to include financial criminal activities associated with the facilitation of severe forms of trafficking in persons within the factors considered as indicia of serious and sustained efforts to eliminate severe forms of trafficking in persons, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/09/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/09/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/09/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 04/09/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/09/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/09/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 05/09/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/09/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 05/14/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/15/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/20/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 05/21/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/21/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 05/22/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 05/23/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/23/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 05/23/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 06/03/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/03/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/04/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 06/04/2019
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/04/2019
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 06/04/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/04/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 06/04/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/05/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 06/06/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 06/06/2019
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 06/06/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 06/06/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 06/10/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/10/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 06/11/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 06/12/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 06/14/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 06/20/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/28/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/28/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 06/28/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 07/12/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/12/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 07/17/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/17/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 07/22/2019
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 09/17/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 09/24/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 10/08/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 10/08/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 12/17/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 12/17/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/28/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/09/2019 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations04/26/2019 Referred to

As of 08/12/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2149 - Exposing the Financing of Human Trafficking Act


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2149. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/09/2019)

Exposing the Financing of Human Trafficking Act

This bill modifies the minimum standard for foreign government action toward the elimination of human trafficking. Specifically, an assessment of whether a government has made serious and sustained efforts to eliminate severe forms of trafficking shall include consideration as to whether the government vigorously investigates, seeks to prevent, and prosecutes financial crimes associated with such trafficking.