There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Home Health Care Planning Improvement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to ensure more timely access to home health services for Medicare beneficiaries under the Medicare program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/09/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
04/09/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/09/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/09/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/09/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (102)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 04/09/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/09/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16]* 04/09/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 04/09/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 04/09/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 04/12/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 04/12/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/12/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/12/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 04/12/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 04/12/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/12/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/12/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/18/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/18/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/01/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/01/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/01/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/01/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 05/01/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/01/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/01/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 05/01/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 05/01/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/01/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/01/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/01/2019
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/01/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 05/01/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 05/01/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 05/01/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/01/2019
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large] 05/01/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 05/09/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/09/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/14/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/14/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 05/14/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/14/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/14/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/14/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 05/14/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/14/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/14/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/14/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/14/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/14/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/14/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/14/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 05/15/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/15/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 05/15/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/16/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 05/16/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/16/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 05/21/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/21/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 05/22/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/24/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/24/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 05/24/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 06/06/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/06/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/06/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 06/06/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/06/2019
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/06/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/06/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/26/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/26/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/26/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/26/2019
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/26/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/26/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/26/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/26/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/26/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/12/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 07/12/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/12/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/12/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 07/12/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/12/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 07/12/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 07/12/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 07/12/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 07/12/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 07/12/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/12/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/12/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 07/16/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/16/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 07/16/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/16/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 07/25/2019
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 07/25/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/25/2019
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 07/25/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/25/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 08/02/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 08/02/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 08/02/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/09/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health04/09/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce04/09/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2150. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/09/2019)

Home Health Care Planning Improvement Act of 2019

This bill allows Medicare payment for home health services ordered by a nurse practitioner, a clinical nurse specialist, a certified nurse-midwife, or a physician assistant. Currently, coverage is provided only for services ordered by a physician.