There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

RECLAIM Act of 2019
Revitalizing the Economy of Coal Communities by Leveraging Local Activities and Investing More Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

RECLAIM Act of 2019
Revitalizing the Economy of Coal Communities by Leveraging Local Activities and Investing More Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Surface Mining Control and Reclamation Act of 1977 to provide funds to States and Indian tribes for the purpose of promoting economic revitalization, diversification, and development in economically distressed communities through the reclamation and restoration of land and water resources adversely affected by coal mining carried out before August 3, 1977, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
10/04/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-223.
04/09/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
10/04/2019Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 176.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/04/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-223.
05/01/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 10.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/01/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/09/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/09/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 04/09/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 04/09/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15]* 04/09/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/30/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/30/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/30/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/30/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/30/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 04/30/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/30/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/30/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 04/30/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/30/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/30/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/30/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/30/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/30/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 04/30/2019
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 04/30/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 04/30/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/30/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 04/30/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 04/30/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 05/01/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 05/01/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 05/01/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 05/07/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/08/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/09/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/09/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/17/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 05/21/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/30/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 06/05/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/05/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/10/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 06/10/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 06/11/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/11/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/18/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/18/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 06/20/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 06/25/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/27/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 07/05/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/09/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/09/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/09/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 07/11/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 07/11/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 07/11/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/11/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/11/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/15/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/16/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/17/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/23/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 07/25/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/30/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2019
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2] 08/02/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 08/27/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 09/17/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 09/24/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 09/24/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/09/2019 Referred to
05/01/2019 Markup by
10/04/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-223

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2156. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (10/04/2019)

Revitalizing the Economy of Coal Communities by Leveraging Local Activities and Investing More Act of 2019 or the RECLAIM Act of 2019

This bill expands the uses of the Abandoned Mine Reclamation Fund to provide support for economic revitalization, diversification, and development in economically distressed mining communities through the reclamation and restoration of land and water resources adversely affected by coal mining carried out before August 3, 1977.

Specifically, it makes specified funds available to the Department of the Interior through FY2024 for distribution to states and Native American tribes for reclaiming and restoring abandoned mine lands and waters in such communities.