There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

REAL Act of 2019
Restoring Education And Learning Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reinstate Federal Pell Grant eligibility for individuals incarcerated in Federal and State penal institutions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/09/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/09/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/09/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 04/09/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/09/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 04/09/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 04/09/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 04/29/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/27/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/09/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 07/17/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/30/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 07/30/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 08/30/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 08/30/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 08/30/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/11/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 09/11/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 09/16/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/17/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/19/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/19/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/26/2019
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 09/26/2019
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 09/26/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 10/04/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 10/04/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 10/04/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 10/11/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/16/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/17/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/17/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 10/22/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 11/13/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/13/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 11/18/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 11/21/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 11/21/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 11/26/2019
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 12/03/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 12/03/2019
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large] 12/03/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/10/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 01/15/2020
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/24/2020
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 02/05/2020
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 02/10/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 02/28/2020
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 03/04/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/04/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/22/2020
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/15/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/24/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/26/2020
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 09/16/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor04/09/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2168. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/09/2019)

Restoring Education And Learning Act of 2019 or the REAL Act of 2019

This bill restores Pell Grant eligibility for individuals incarcerated in a federal or state penal institution and for sex offenders subject to civil commitment following incarceration.