There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Digital Coast Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Digital Coast Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Commerce, acting through the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, to establish a constituent-driven program to provide a digital information platform capable of efficiently integrating coastal data with decision-support tools, training, and best practices and to support collection of priority coastal geospatial data to inform and improve local, State, regional, and Federal capacities to manage the coastal region, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/26/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-315.
04/09/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
11/26/2019Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 256.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/26/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-315.
09/18/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/18/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/18/2019Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
05/08/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife
04/23/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/09/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/09/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/09/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 05/10/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 05/10/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 07/09/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/09/2019 Referred to
09/18/2019 Markup by
11/26/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-315
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife04/23/2019 Referred to
05/08/2019 Hearings by
09/18/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2189. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/09/2019)

Digital Coast Act

This bill provides statutory authority for and revises the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration's (NOAA's) Digital Coast program. (The program currently exists under NOAA to provide data, tools, and training that communities use to manage their coastal resources.)

NOAA must focus on filling data needs and gaps for critical coastal management issues and support continued improvement in existing efforts to coordinate the acquisition and integration of key data sets needed for coastal management.

NOAA may enter into financial agreements and collect fees to carry out the program.