There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To modify the presumption of service connection for veterans who were exposed to herbicide agents while serving in the Armed Forces in Thailand during the Vietnam era, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/29/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/10/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (79)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1]* 04/10/2019
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/25/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 04/25/2019
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 04/29/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 04/29/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/01/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/01/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 05/14/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 05/14/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/30/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 06/04/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/11/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/11/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 06/11/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/11/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/10/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 07/10/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/10/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/16/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/16/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/24/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/06/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 09/06/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 09/16/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 09/16/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/24/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 09/24/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 09/24/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/24/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 09/24/2019
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 10/01/2019
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/01/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 10/01/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 10/04/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 10/08/2019
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 10/08/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 10/08/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 10/17/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 10/17/2019
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 10/17/2019
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/23/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/23/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/23/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 10/23/2019
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 11/05/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 11/05/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 11/05/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/21/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 11/21/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 11/21/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 12/03/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 12/03/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/11/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 01/10/2020
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/28/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 01/29/2020
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/07/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 02/12/2020
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/21/2020
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 02/25/2020
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 02/25/2020
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 04/28/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 08/22/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs04/10/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs04/29/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2201. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/10/2019)

This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs to ensure that, if it creates a presumption of service-connection between the occurrence of a disease and exposure to an herbicide agent while serving in the Armed Forces during the Vietnam era at a military base in Thailand, such presumption must also apply to exposure at any military base in Thailand, regardless of where on the base the veteran was located or what military job specialty the veteran performed.