There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Homeland Security Improvement Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Homeland Security Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To increase transparency, accountability, and community engagement within the Department of Homeland Security, provide independent oversight of border security activities, improve training for agents and officers of U.S. Customs and Border Protection and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
09/25/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 194 (Roll no. 546).(text: CR H7928-7929)
07/19/2019Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
07/19/2019Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
07/19/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-163, Part I.
04/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (28)

Date Chamber
09/26/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/25/2019-6:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2019-6:09pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 194 (Roll no. 546). (text: CR H7928-7929)
09/25/2019-6:02pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 207 - 216 (Roll no. 545).
09/25/2019-5:54pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
09/25/2019-5:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Green (TN) motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add language at the end of section 711 of the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Ombudsman to include additional information inspecific reports.
09/25/2019-5:45pmHouseMr. Green (TN) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Homeland Security. (text: CR H7974)
09/25/2019-5:44pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7974-7976)
09/25/2019-4:22pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule 19, the Chair postponed further proceedings on H.R. 2203.
09/25/2019-4:22pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
09/25/2019-4:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House resumed with debate on H.R. 2203.
09/25/2019-3:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2203.
09/25/2019-3:44pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525 and H. Res. 576. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525, and H.Res. 576 under closed rules. Rule also provides that it shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of September 26, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules; and provides for proceedings during the period from September 30, 2019, through October 14, 2019
09/25/2019-3:44pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 577. (consideration: CR H7928-7934)
09/24/2019-7:28pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 577 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525 and H. Res. 576. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525, and H.Res. 576 under closed rules. Rule also provides that it shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of September 26, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules; and provides for proceedings during the period from September 30, 2019, through October 14, 2019
07/19/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 122.
07/19/2019HouseCommittee on Ways and Means discharged.
07/19/2019HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
07/19/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-163, Part I.
07/17/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 13.
07/17/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/17/2019HouseSubcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations Discharged.
05/15/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/23/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
04/10/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/10/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/10/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/10/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security04/10/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Markup by
07/19/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-163
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations04/23/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Discharged from
House Judiciary04/10/2019 Referred to
07/19/2019 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship05/15/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means04/10/2019 Referred to
07/19/2019 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/26/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2203. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/25/2019)

This bill establishes the position of Ombudsman for Border and Immigration Related Concerns within the Department of Homeland Security (DHS). The ombudsman shall

  • establish an independent, neutral, and standardized process to assist individuals in resolving complaints related to U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), and related entities;
  • make recommendations to DHS to address chronic issues identified in the complaints process;
  • establish a Border Oversight Panel, which shall make recommendations related to border enforcement policies and strategies;
  • review ICE and CBP compliance with departmental policies and standards of care for detained aliens;
  • establish a Border Community Liaison in each Border Patrol sector on the northern and southern borders, which shall consult with and receive feedback from border communities on ICE and CBP policies and activities;
  • conduct yearly evaluations of training for ICE and CBP agents and officers, including whether such training adequately addresses the use of force and civil rights issues;
  • develop recommendations for establishing an electronic number system for tracking a child that has been separated from a parent, legal guardian, or relative; and
  • report to Congress a plan to require the use of body-worn cameras by Border Patrol agents and ICE officers.