There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Cabin Air Safety Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve the safety of the air supply on commercial aircraft, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
04/11/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/10/2019Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E445)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 04/18/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/07/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 05/08/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/17/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 05/21/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 05/23/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/24/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/30/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/04/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/10/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/11/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/25/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/09/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 07/12/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 07/16/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/16/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/24/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/30/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 08/02/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 08/06/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 08/06/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/06/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 08/20/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 08/20/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 08/30/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/10/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/10/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 09/12/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 09/19/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 09/24/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/26/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/04/2019
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 10/04/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 10/08/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/11/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 10/11/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 10/15/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 10/15/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/15/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 10/16/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/16/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/16/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 10/21/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/28/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 10/28/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 10/30/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 11/08/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 11/08/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 11/08/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/14/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/20/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 11/20/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/20/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/20/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 11/22/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 11/22/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/22/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 12/03/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/08/2020
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/08/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 01/13/2020
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 01/15/2020
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/21/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 01/24/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 01/28/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 02/03/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 02/14/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 02/25/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 02/27/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 02/27/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/12/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 07/01/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/29/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 08/28/2020
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/14/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/10/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation04/11/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2208. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/10/2019)

Cabin Air Safety Act of 2019

This bill directs the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) to implement regulations regarding smoke or fume incidents on commercial aircraft (excluding helicopters).

Specifically, the bill requires

  • flight attendants, pilots, aircraft maintenance technicians, airport first responders, and emergency response teams to receive annual training on how to respond to incidents involving smoke or fumes on board commercial aircraft;
  • the FAA to develop a standardized form for reporting incidents involving smoke or fumes;
  • the FAA to conduct an investigation after a report is submitted about incidents of smoke or fumes; and
  • commercial air carriers to install and operate onboard carbon monoxide detectors.