There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

STURDY Act
Stop Tip-overs of Unstable, Risky Dressers on Youth Act

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

STURDY Act
Stop Tip-overs of Unstable, Risky Dressers on Youth Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

STURDY Act
Stop Tip-overs of Unstable, Risky Dressers on Youth Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Consumer Product Safety Commission to promulgate a consumer product safety rule for free-standing clothing storage units to protect children from tip-over related death or injury, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/17/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7720)
09/16/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-209.
04/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/18/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
09/17/2019-4:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/17/2019-4:12pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7720)
09/17/2019-4:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2211.
09/17/2019-4:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7720-7723)
09/17/2019-4:01pmHouseMs. Schakowsky moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/16/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 166.
09/16/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-209.
07/17/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/17/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/10/2019HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce
07/10/2019HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce
06/13/2019HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce
04/11/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/10/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
04/10/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (23)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce04/10/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Markup by
09/16/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-209
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce04/11/2019 Referred to
06/13/2019 Hearings by
07/10/2019 Markup by
07/10/2019 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation09/18/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2211. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/17/2019)

Stop Tip-overs of Unstable, Risky Dressers on Youth Act or the STURDY Act

This bill requires the Consumer Product Safety Commission to revise the safety standards for freestanding clothing storage units such as a dressers, bureaus, or chests of drawers. Such standards must include specified testing related to tip overs and new warning requirements for all such products entering the U.S. market.