There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop for School Buses Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Transportation to conduct research on and implement certain safety measures and programs to prevent illegal passing of school buses, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
04/11/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/10/2019Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2019Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/25/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 05/02/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/02/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 05/07/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 05/08/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/09/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 05/14/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 05/14/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/14/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/16/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 05/16/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/16/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 05/16/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 05/20/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 05/21/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/21/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/22/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 05/28/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/28/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/28/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 05/28/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 05/30/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 06/04/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 06/04/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/18/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 06/19/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/24/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/02/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/02/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 07/15/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 07/17/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/22/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 07/22/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 07/23/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 07/23/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/24/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/25/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 07/30/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 08/02/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 08/02/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 08/02/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/20/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 08/20/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 08/20/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/20/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/10/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit04/11/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor04/10/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.