There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Homeless Veterans with Children Reintegration Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of Labor to prioritize the provision of services to homeless veterans with dependent children in carrying out homeless veterans reintegration programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/02/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/02/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/10/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 04/29/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/29/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 07/09/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/06/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 08/23/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/10/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health05/02/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity05/02/2019 Referred to

As of 10/23/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2224 - Homeless Veterans with Children Reintegration Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.