There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

CECIL Act
Conserving Ecosystems by Ceasing the Importation of Large Animal Trophies Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Endangered Species Act of 1973 to prohibit import and export of any species listed or proposed to be listed under such Act as a threatened species or endangered species, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
09/18/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 16.
09/18/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/18/2019Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
07/18/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife
04/29/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/10/2019Referred to the Subcommitte on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/10/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/16/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/16/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/16/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/16/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/22/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/30/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 06/12/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 06/12/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/12/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/09/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 07/09/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/13/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 08/13/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/23/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 09/06/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/17/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/17/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/17/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/18/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 09/26/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/26/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 10/04/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/04/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 10/08/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/08/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 10/08/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/08/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/08/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 10/08/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/08/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/11/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 10/11/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 10/11/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/11/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 10/11/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/15/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/15/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 10/16/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 10/16/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/10/2019 Referred to
09/18/2019 Markup by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife04/29/2019 Referred to
07/18/2019 Hearings by
09/18/2019 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs04/10/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means04/10/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade04/10/2019 Referred to

As of 10/17/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2245 - CECIL Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2245. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/10/2019)

Conserving Ecosystems by Ceasing the Importation of Large Animal Trophies Act or the CECIL Act

This bill addresses international wildlife conservation efforts and trophy hunting.

Specifically, this bill restricts (1) the importation or exportation of species that have been proposed to be listed as threatened or endangered species, or (2) the importation of a sport-hunted trophy of a threatened species or endangered species.

In addition, the bill abolishes the International Wildlife Conservation Council of the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service.

Finally, the Government Accountability Office must study the effectiveness of trophy hunting in supporting international wildlife conservation efforts.