There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Integrity in Testing for Lead in Military Housing Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Defense to establish a policy relating to lead testing on military installations.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/11/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
04/10/2019Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 05/16/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/03/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services04/10/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness04/11/2019 Referred to

As of 06/24/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2252 - Integrity in Testing for Lead in Military Housing Act of 2019.


Subjects (0)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.