There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend titles 10 and 37, United States Code, to ensure that children covered by the TRICARE program are screened and tested for lead levels, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/11/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
04/10/2019Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 05/16/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/03/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services04/10/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel04/11/2019 Referred to

As of 06/20/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2254 - To amend titles 10 and 37, United States Code, to ensure that children covered by the TRICARE program are screened and tested for lead levels, and for other purposes..


Subjects (0)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.