There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Driving America Forward Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to modify limitations on the credit for plug-in electric drive motor vehicles, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/10/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 05/07/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 05/07/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 05/07/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/07/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/07/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/07/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 05/07/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/07/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/07/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 05/07/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 05/16/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 05/23/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/23/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/03/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/03/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 06/03/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 06/03/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/03/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/03/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/03/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/03/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/03/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/03/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/04/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/04/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/04/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 06/04/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/06/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/06/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 06/06/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 06/10/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 06/10/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/10/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/10/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/10/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 06/12/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 06/12/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/12/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 06/13/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 06/13/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/13/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/13/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 06/18/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 06/18/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/18/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/18/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/18/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/18/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/18/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/18/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 06/18/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 06/18/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/20/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/20/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/20/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/20/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/20/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/20/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/10/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2256. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/10/2019)

Driving America Forward Act

This bill expands the tax credit for new plug-in electric drive motor vehicles and extends the tax credit for new fuel cell motor vehicles.

(Under current law, taxpayers who purchase a qualified plug-in electric drive motor vehicle are eligible for a tax credit of up to $7,500, which begins to phase out once a manufacturer sells 200,000 qualified vehicles.) The bill allows an additional 400,000 vehicles per manufacturer to be eligible for a credit of up to $7,000 before the credit begins to phase out.

The bill also extends the tax credit for fuel cell motor vehicles through 2028. (Under current law, the credit expired after 2017.)