There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Conservation Corps Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish a veterans conservation corps, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
05/20/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/02/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/11/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/11/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/10/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
04/10/2019Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2019Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2019Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2019Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 04/10/2019

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/10/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity05/02/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/10/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management04/11/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment04/11/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary04/10/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security05/20/2019 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology04/10/2019 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Research and Technology04/10/2019 Referred to

As of 08/25/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2274 - Veterans Conservation Corps Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.