There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Safe Step Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 to require a group health plan (or health insurance coverage offered in connection with such a plan) to provide an exceptions process for any medication step therapy protocol, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/10/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 04/10/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/02/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 05/02/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 05/02/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/02/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/02/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/02/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/02/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 05/02/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 05/02/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/02/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/02/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 05/02/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 05/02/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 05/02/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 05/02/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 05/02/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/02/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/16/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/16/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/16/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/16/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/16/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/16/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 05/16/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/16/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 05/16/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/16/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/16/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 05/16/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 05/16/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 05/16/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/16/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/16/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/16/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/16/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/16/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 05/16/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/16/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/16/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/28/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/28/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 05/28/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/28/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 05/28/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/28/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/28/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 05/28/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/28/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 05/28/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/28/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/28/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/28/2019
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 05/28/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 05/28/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 05/28/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/14/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/14/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 06/14/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 06/14/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/14/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/14/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/14/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/14/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 06/14/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 06/14/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 06/14/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/14/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 06/14/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 06/21/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/21/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 06/21/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor04/10/2019 Referred to

As of 06/24/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2279 - Safe Step Act.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.