There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Anti-Lunch Shaming Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act to prohibit the stigmatization of children who are unable to pay for meals.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/12/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/12/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (95)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 04/12/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/07/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/07/2019
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/07/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/30/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/30/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 05/30/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 05/30/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 05/30/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/30/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/30/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/30/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/30/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/30/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 06/10/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/10/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/20/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/02/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 07/02/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/02/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/09/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/09/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/09/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 07/09/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/09/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 07/09/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/09/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/09/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 07/09/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/09/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/09/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 07/11/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/11/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/11/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/11/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/11/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/11/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/11/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/11/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/11/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/11/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 07/11/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/11/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/15/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/15/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/15/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 07/15/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 07/24/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 07/24/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/24/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 07/24/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/24/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 07/24/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/24/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/24/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/24/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/10/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 09/10/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 09/10/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/10/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 09/10/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/10/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 09/10/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 09/10/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/10/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/10/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 10/11/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/16/2019
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/21/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/21/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 10/21/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 10/23/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/28/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/12/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 11/18/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/07/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 02/04/2020
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 02/04/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 02/12/2020
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 03/03/2020
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/12/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 05/12/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/12/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/12/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and Labor04/12/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2311. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/12/2019)

Anti-Lunch Shaming Act of 2019

This bill prohibits the stigmatization of a child who is unable to pay for meals provided by schools under the National School Lunch Program or the School Breakfast Program.

The bill applies to a child who either does not have funds to pay for a meal or has outstanding credit that was extended by a school food authority (SFA).

A SFA may not permit public identification or stigmatization of the child, such as by requiring a wristband or hand stamp. The child also may not be required to (1) perform chores or activities that are not required of students generally, or (2) dispose of food after it has been served to the child.

Any communication related to outstanding credit must be directed to the child's parent or guardian. A child may be required to deliver a letter regarding outstanding credit that is addressed to a parent or guardian if the letter is not distributed to the child in a manner that stigmatizes the child.

The bill also expresses the sense of Congress regarding several issues regarding the administration of the school meal programs.