There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Nuclear Powers America Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for an investment tax credit related to the production of electricity from nuclear energy.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/12/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/12/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 04/12/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 05/02/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 05/07/2019
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 05/09/2019
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/14/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/20/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/22/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/11/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/11/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/13/2019
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 06/21/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 06/27/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 06/27/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 07/11/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/17/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/17/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 07/25/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 07/25/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 08/06/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 08/06/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/09/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/24/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/15/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/27/2020
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/09/2020
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/09/2020
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 03/09/2020
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/10/2020
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/10/2020
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 03/10/2020
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/21/2020
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 05/05/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/12/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2314. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/12/2019)

Nuclear Powers America Act of 2019

This bill allows a tax credit for investments in qualified nuclear energy property placed in service before January 1, 2026. The credit applies to any amounts paid or incurred for refueling or other specified expenditures for a nuclear power plant for which an application for license renewal was or will be submitted to the Nuclear Regulatory Commission before January 1, 2026.