There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Community Health Investment, Modernization, and Excellence Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize and extend funding for community health centers and the National Health Service Corps.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/15/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/04/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
04/16/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/15/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/15/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 04/15/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/18/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 04/18/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/18/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 04/25/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/25/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/30/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/02/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/02/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/02/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/02/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/14/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 05/14/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 05/14/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/03/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/03/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/03/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/03/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/03/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/03/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/03/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 06/03/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/03/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/03/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/03/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/03/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 06/03/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/04/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/04/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/04/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/04/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/04/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/06/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 06/06/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/06/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/06/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/10/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/10/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/10/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 06/10/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/10/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/10/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/10/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 06/10/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/11/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 06/11/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 06/12/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/15/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/16/2019 Referred to
06/04/2019 Hearings by

As of 06/16/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2328 - Community Health Investment, Modernization, and Excellence Act of 2019.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.