Committees: H.R.2328 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce04/15/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Markup by
12/09/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-332
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/16/2019 Referred to
06/04/2019 Hearings by
07/11/2019 Markup by
07/11/2019 Reported by
House Transportation and Infrastructure12/09/2019 Referred to
12/31/2020 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation12/10/2019 Referred to