There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Support for Suicide Prevention Coordinators Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Support for Suicide Prevention Coordinators Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Support for Suicide Prevention Coordinators Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Support for Suicide Prevention Coordinators Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Support for Suicide Prevention Coordinators Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Comptroller General of the United States to conduct an assessment of the responsibilities, workload, and vacancy rates of Department of Veterans Affairs suicide prevention coordinators, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2019Became Public Law No: 116-96. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2019Signed by President.
12/19/2019Presented to President.
12/11/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 95 - 0. Record Vote Number: 390.(consideration: CR S6967)
05/21/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4039)
05/17/2019Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-70.
04/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/20/2019Became Public Law No: 116-96. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2019Signed by President.
12/19/2019HousePresented to President.
12/12/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/11/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 95 - 0. Record Vote Number: 390. (consideration: CR S6967)
05/22/2019SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
05/21/2019-4:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2019-4:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4039)
05/21/2019-4:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2333.
05/21/2019-4:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4039-4041)
05/21/2019-4:16pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/17/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 46.
05/17/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-70.
05/02/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/30/2019HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
04/30/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/18/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/18/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/18/2019 Referred to
05/17/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-70
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health04/30/2019 Referred to
04/30/2019 Hearings by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity05/02/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.2333. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-96 (12/20/2019)

Support for Suicide Prevention Coordinators Act

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Government Accountability Office to report on the responsibilities, workload, training, and vacancy rates of suicide prevention coordinators at the Department of Veterans Affairs.