There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Odessa, Texas, as the "Wilson and Young Medal of Honor VA Clinic".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/13/2019Became Public Law No: 116-87. (TXT | PDF)
12/13/2019Signed by President.
12/04/2019Presented to President.
11/21/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
11/21/2019Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6767)
10/15/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8132)
04/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
12/13/2019Became Public Law No: 116-87. (TXT | PDF)
12/13/2019Signed by President.
12/04/2019HousePresented to President.
11/25/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/21/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
11/21/2019SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6767)
10/16/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
10/15/2019-5:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/15/2019-5:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8132)
10/15/2019-5:02pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2334.
10/15/2019-5:02pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8132-8135)
10/15/2019-5:02pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/02/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/18/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/18/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27]* 04/18/2019
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Roy, Chip [R-TX-21]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/25/2019
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/25/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/25/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/29/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/29/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 04/30/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 05/01/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 05/01/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 05/01/2019
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/03/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 05/09/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 05/15/2019
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 05/17/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/17/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/18/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health05/02/2019 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs10/16/2019 Referred to
11/21/2019 Discharged from

As of 02/17/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2334 - To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Odessa, Texas, as the "Wilson and Young Medal of Honor VA Clinic".


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.2334. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-87 (12/13/2019)

This bill designates the community-based outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Odessa, Texas, as the "Wilson and Young Medal of Honor VA Clinic."