There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Family Farmer Relief Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Family Farmer Relief Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

Family Farmer Relief Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Family Farmer Relief Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Family Farmer Relief Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 11, United States Code, with respect to the definition of "family farmer".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
08/23/2019Became Public Law No: 116-51. (TXT | PDF)
08/23/2019Signed by President.
08/13/2019Presented to President.
08/01/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S5321)
07/25/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7438)
07/24/2019Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-182.
04/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/23/2019Became Public Law No: 116-51. (TXT | PDF)
08/23/2019Signed by President.
08/13/2019HousePresented to President.
08/01/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5321)
07/29/2019SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
07/25/2019-4:25pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/25/2019-4:25pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7438)
07/25/2019-4:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2336.
07/25/2019-4:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7438-7439)
07/25/2019-4:16pmHouseMr. Cicilline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/24/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 141.
07/24/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-182.
07/11/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/11/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/20/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/18/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
04/18/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (27)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/18/2019 Referred to
07/11/2019 Markup by
07/24/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-182
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law05/20/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.