There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Reversing the Youth Tobacco Epidemic Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act with respect to the sale and marketing of tobacco products, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
11/19/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 24.
11/19/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/13/2019Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
11/13/2019Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
10/16/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
04/19/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/18/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (98)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 04/18/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/25/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/25/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/25/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 05/02/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 05/14/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 05/14/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/30/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 05/30/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/12/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/12/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/12/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/12/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/12/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/12/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/20/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/20/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/20/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/28/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/28/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/28/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/09/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/09/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/09/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 07/25/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/25/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 08/06/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/09/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/20/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 09/06/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 09/06/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 09/09/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 09/09/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 09/11/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/11/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 09/11/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/11/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/11/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 09/12/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 09/16/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/16/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/16/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 09/16/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 09/16/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/16/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/16/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/24/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 09/24/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/24/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 09/24/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/24/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/24/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 09/24/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 09/24/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/24/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/24/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 09/24/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 09/26/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/26/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 09/26/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 10/04/2019
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 10/04/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 10/04/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/08/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 10/08/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 10/08/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/11/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 10/11/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 10/11/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 10/11/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/11/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 10/21/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 10/21/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/21/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 10/21/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 10/21/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 10/28/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 10/28/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 10/28/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 10/28/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/28/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 10/28/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 10/30/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/30/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 11/01/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 11/01/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/05/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 11/12/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 11/12/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/13/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/13/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 11/13/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/21/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 11/21/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 11/21/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 11/26/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 12/03/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 12/05/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/18/2019 Referred to
11/19/2019 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/19/2019 Referred to
10/16/2019 Hearings by
11/13/2019 Markup by
11/13/2019 Reported by

As of 12/06/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2339 - Reversing the Youth Tobacco Epidemic Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.