There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

FIGHT Veteran Suicides Act
Fostering Intergovernmental Health Transparency in Veteran Suicides Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

FIGHT Veteran Suicides Act
Fostering Intergovernmental Health Transparency in Veteran Suicides Act

Short Titles as Introduced

FIGHT Veteran Suicides Act
Fostering Intergovernmental Health Transparency in Veteran Suicides Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide to Congress notice of any suicide or attempted suicide of a veteran in a Department of Veterans Affairs facility, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/21/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4041)
05/20/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-77.
04/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
05/22/2019SenateReceived in the Senate.
05/21/2019-4:38pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2019-4:38pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4041)
05/21/2019-4:32pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2340.
05/21/2019-4:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4041-4042)
05/21/2019-4:31pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/20/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 53.
05/20/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-77.
05/08/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/08/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/30/2019HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
04/30/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/18/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/18/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/18/2019 Referred to
05/08/2019 Markup by
05/20/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-77
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health04/30/2019 Referred to
04/30/2019 Hearings by

As of 09/20/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2340 - FIGHT Veteran Suicides Act


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2340. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (05/20/2019)

Fostering Intergovernmental Health Transparency in Veteran Suicides Act or FIGHT Veteran Suicides Act

This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to notify Congress following a suicide or attempted suicide of a veteran that occurs in a VA facility. Specifically, the VA must provide the name and location of the facility and also specific information regarding the veteran who committed or attempted suicide. The VA is required to include in each notification (1) guidance to deter the sensationalism of suicide, (2) guidance for identifying warning signs exhibited by veterans at risk of suicide, and (3) information on the resources available from the VA to veterans at risk of suicide.