There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Whole Veteran Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Whole Veteran Act

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Whole Veteran Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Whole Veteran Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Whole Veteran Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to submit to Congress a report on the Department of Veterans Affairs advancing of whole health transformation.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
10/30/2020Became Public Law No: 116-185. (TXT | PDF)
10/30/2020Signed by President.
10/20/2020Presented to President.
10/01/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
05/21/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4032)
05/17/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-71.
04/25/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/30/2020Became Public Law No: 116-185. (TXT | PDF)
10/30/2020Signed by President.
10/20/2020HousePresented to President.
10/06/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/01/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6031)
05/22/2019SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
05/21/2019-3:38pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2019-3:38pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4032)
05/21/2019-3:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2359.
05/21/2019-3:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4032-4034)
05/21/2019-3:21pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/17/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 47.
05/17/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-71.
05/08/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/08/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/02/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/25/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/25/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 05/09/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs04/25/2019 Referred to
05/08/2019 Markup by
05/17/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-71
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health05/02/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2359.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.2359. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-185 (10/30/2020)

Whole Veteran Act

This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs to report on the implementation of its whole health approach to health care. The report must include an analysis of the accessibility and availability of a variety of services, including hypnosis and acupuncture. The whole health model is a holistic approach that looks at the many areas of life that may affect health in order to make a health plan suited for each individual based on his or her health goals.