There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

No Budget, No Pay Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that the salaries of Members of a House of Congress will be held in escrow if that House has not agreed to a concurrent resolution on the budget for fiscal year 2020 by April 15, 2019.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/03/2019Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 01/24/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 01/24/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 02/06/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/14/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration01/03/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.236. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2019)

No Budget, No Pay Act

This bill withholds the salaries of Members of a chamber of Congress that has not agreed to a budget resolution for FY2020 by April 15, 2019, as required by the Congressional Budget Act of 1974.

Salaries are withheld from April 16, 2019, until the chamber of Congress agrees to a budget resolution or the last day of the 116th Congress, whichever is earlier.