There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Care Quality Transparency Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans' Care Quality Transparency Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Care Quality Transparency Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Comptroller General of the United States to conduct an assessment of all memoranda of understanding and memoranda of agreement between Under Secretary of Health and non-Department of Veterans Affairs entities relating to suicide prevention and mental health services.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/21/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4043-4044)
05/17/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-72.
04/25/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
05/22/2019SenateReceived in the Senate.
05/21/2019-5:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2019-5:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4043-4044)
05/21/2019-4:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2372.
05/21/2019-4:49pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4043-4045)
05/21/2019-4:49pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/17/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 48.
05/17/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-72.
05/08/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/08/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/02/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/25/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/25/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 05/16/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/25/2019 Referred to
05/08/2019 Markup by
05/17/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-72
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health05/02/2019 Referred to

As of 08/23/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2372 - Veterans' Care Quality Transparency Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.