There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Bulletproof Vest Partnership Grant Program.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
05/23/2019Became Public Law No: 116-18.
05/23/2019Signed by President.
05/20/2019Presented to President.
05/16/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S2901)
05/14/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 9 (Roll no. 204).(text: CR H3751)
04/29/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
05/23/2019Became Public Law No: 116-18.
05/23/2019Signed by President.
05/20/2019HousePresented to President.
05/16/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/16/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2901)
05/15/2019SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
05/14/2019-7:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/14/2019-7:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 9 (Roll no. 204). (text: CR H3751)
05/14/2019-6:58pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3771-3772)
05/14/2019-4:06pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/14/2019-3:32pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2379.
05/14/2019-3:32pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3751-3755)
05/14/2019-3:32pmHouseMr. Johnson (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/29/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
04/29/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/29/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.