There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To permit the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish a grant program to conduct cemetery research and produce educational materials for the Veterans Legacy Program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/29/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
05/08/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/08/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/06/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/29/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/29/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 05/09/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/29/2019 Referred to
05/08/2019 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs05/06/2019 Referred to

As of 06/24/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2385 - To permit the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish a grant program to conduct cemetery research and produce educational materials for the Veterans Legacy Program..


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.