There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

American Manufacturing Leadership Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

American Manufacturing Leadership Act

Short Titles as Introduced

American Manufacturing Leadership Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend the National Institute of Standards and Technology Act to make changes to the implementation of the Manufacturing USA Network, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Institute of Standards and Technology Act to make changes to the implementation of the network for manufacturing innovation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/23/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7168-7170)
06/19/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-121.
04/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
07/24/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
07/23/2019-2:36pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2019-2:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2019-2:36pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7168-7170)
07/23/2019-2:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2397.
07/23/2019-2:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7168-7172)
07/23/2019-2:21pmHouseMs. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/19/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 89.
06/19/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-121.
05/01/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
05/01/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
04/30/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
04/30/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology04/30/2019 Referred to
05/01/2019 Markup by
06/19/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-121
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/24/2019 Referred to

As of 12/09/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2397 - American Manufacturing Leadership Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2397. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/30/2019)

American Manufacturing Leadership Act

This bill revises the National Institute of Standards and Technology's Manufacturing USA program and extends through FY2024 and revises the Economic Development Administration's Regional Innovation Program.

The bill grants certain authorities of the Department of Commerce under the Manufacturing USA program to additional federal agencies.

All centers under the Manufacturing USA program shall (currently, may) conduct research and development and related activities.

The Manufacturing USA program office must, among other things, help develop pilot programs that may be implemented for manufacturing innovation.

The General Accountability Office shall triennially assess Manufacturing USA program operations.