There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Duty to Report Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to require reporting to the Federal Election Commission and the Federal Bureau of Investigation of offers by foreign nationals to make prohibited contributions, donations, expenditures, or disbursements, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/20/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/30/2019Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/30/2019Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/30/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/30/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/30/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 04/30/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 04/30/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/30/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/10/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/10/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/10/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/10/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 05/10/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/10/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 05/10/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/10/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/20/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/20/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/20/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/20/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/20/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 05/23/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 05/23/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 05/23/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/23/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/23/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 05/23/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 06/11/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/11/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 06/11/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/13/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/13/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 06/13/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/13/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/18/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 06/18/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/21/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 06/21/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 06/21/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/25/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/25/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/27/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/27/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/27/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/15/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/15/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/30/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/30/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/30/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 07/30/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration04/30/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary04/30/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties05/20/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.