There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

CASE Act of 2019
Copyright Alternative in Small-Claims Enforcement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 17, United States Code, to establish an alternative dispute resolution program for copyright small claims, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/01/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
09/10/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/10/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/10/2019Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet Discharged.
05/20/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/01/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/01/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (130)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 05/10/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/10/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/16/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/16/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 05/23/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 05/23/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/23/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/23/2019
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 06/04/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/04/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 06/04/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 06/04/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 06/04/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/04/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/04/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 06/04/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 06/11/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 06/11/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 06/11/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 06/11/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/11/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 06/11/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 06/14/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 06/14/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 06/14/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 06/14/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 06/20/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/20/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/24/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 07/02/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 07/02/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 07/02/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/02/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/09/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/09/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/10/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/10/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 07/10/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 07/10/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/15/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 07/15/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/15/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 07/15/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 07/15/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 07/18/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 07/18/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 07/22/2019
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/22/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 07/25/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/25/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 07/25/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/25/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 07/25/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 07/25/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 07/30/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/30/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/30/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 08/02/2019
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2] 08/02/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 08/02/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 08/06/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 08/06/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 08/06/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 08/06/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 08/16/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 08/16/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 08/16/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 08/16/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 08/16/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 08/16/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 08/16/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 08/27/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 08/27/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 09/06/2019
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 09/06/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 09/06/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 09/09/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/09/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 09/09/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 09/09/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/10/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 09/10/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 09/10/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 09/11/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 09/11/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 09/18/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 09/18/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 09/20/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 09/25/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 09/25/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 09/25/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 09/25/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/26/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 09/26/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 09/26/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/26/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/26/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/26/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 10/01/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/01/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/01/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/01/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/01/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/01/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 10/04/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/04/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 10/04/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/04/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/04/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 10/04/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 10/04/2019
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 10/08/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/08/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 10/08/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 10/08/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 10/08/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 10/08/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 10/11/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 10/11/2019
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/15/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/16/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 10/16/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/01/2019 Referred to
09/10/2019 Markup by
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet05/20/2019 Referred to
09/10/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.