There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Immigrants From Legal Exploitation Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for punishments for immigration-related fraud, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/01/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/20/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/20/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/01/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/01/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/01/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 05/01/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/07/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/15/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/20/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 05/20/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/01/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship05/20/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security05/20/2019 Referred to

As of 01/29/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2430 - Protecting Immigrants From Legal Exploitation Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2430. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/01/2019)

Protecting Immigrants From Legal Exploitation Act of 2019

This bill establishes that certain acts of immigration-related fraud shall be punished by fines, imprisonment, or both.

The bill provides for such punishment for a person who knowingly or recklessly executes a scheme or artifice in a matter arising under immigration law to (1) defraud any person; or (2) obtain anything of value from any person through false pretenses, representations, or promises.

A person who knowingly and falsely represents that such person is an attorney or accredited representative in any matter arising under immigration law shall be subject to such punishment.

The Department of Justice (DOJ) may seek civil injunctions to stop an immigration service provider from further engaging in fraudulent conduct or willfully misrepresenting the provider's authority to provide representation in immigration matters.

An alien who left the United States based on erroneous advice from a person engaged in immigration practitioner fraud or the unauthorized practice of law shall not be barred from reentering the country.

An alien may withdraw an application for immigration benefits that was prepared or submitted by an individual engaging in immigration practitioner fraud or the unauthorized practice of law, if the alien had no prior knowledge of the individual's fraudulent or unauthorized status. The Department of Homeland Security (DHS), the Department of State, and DOJ shall develop procedures for allowing such an alien to submit corrected filings.

DHS and DOJ shall establish a program to provide grants to eligible nonprofit organizations to provide direct legal services to aliens.