There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 5 of the United States Code to modify, for purposes of veterans' preference for Federal hiring, certain requirements with respect to service and retirement, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/01/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
05/01/2019Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/01/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/01/2019
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 05/08/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/08/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/08/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 05/08/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 05/14/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/14/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 05/14/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 05/14/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 05/14/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/14/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 05/20/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 05/20/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 05/20/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 05/20/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 05/23/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 05/23/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 05/23/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 06/11/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/18/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 06/24/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 06/24/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 07/09/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 07/10/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 07/17/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 07/24/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 09/24/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 10/31/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 12/19/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform05/01/2019 Referred to

As of 04/05/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2433 - To amend title 5 of the United States Code to modify, for purposes of veterans' preference for Federal hiring, certain requirements with respect to service and retirement, and for other purposes.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2433. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/01/2019)

This bill modifies the eligibility criteria for certain veterans to qualify for a preference in the federal hiring process.

Specifically, an individual who is honorably discharged from active duty service is eligible for a veterans' preference, if the active duty service was performed for more than 180 total days (currently, consecutive days).

Additionally, a retired member of the Armed Forces is eligible for a veterans' preference, even if the retiree (1) is not a disabled veteran and (2) retired at or above the rank of major or its equivalent.