There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Accelerating Veterans Recovery Outdoors Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish an interagency task force on the use of public lands to provide medical treatment and therapy to veterans through outdoor recreation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/01/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
07/23/2020Committee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/15/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/01/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/01/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (136)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/09/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/09/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 05/14/2019
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 05/14/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/14/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/14/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 05/14/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 05/14/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/14/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 05/16/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/16/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/16/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 05/16/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/17/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 05/17/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/17/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/17/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 05/17/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/20/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/20/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 05/20/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/21/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 05/21/2019
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/28/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 05/28/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 05/28/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/28/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 05/30/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 06/04/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 06/04/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/04/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/10/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 06/10/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 06/10/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/14/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 06/14/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 06/19/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/11/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 07/22/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/30/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 07/30/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/30/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/30/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 08/02/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 08/02/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 08/09/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 08/16/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 08/16/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 08/16/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 08/23/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 08/23/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 08/23/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 08/27/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/27/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 08/30/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 08/30/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 09/06/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 09/06/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/09/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/09/2019
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/09/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/10/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/10/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 09/10/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 09/10/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 09/11/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/12/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/12/2019
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1] 09/12/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/17/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 09/17/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 09/17/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 09/17/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/17/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/18/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/19/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 09/19/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 09/19/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 09/20/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 09/24/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 09/24/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 09/24/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/24/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 09/25/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/27/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 10/01/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/01/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 10/01/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 10/17/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 10/17/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/17/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 10/17/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 10/18/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/21/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 10/21/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 10/23/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 10/23/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/29/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/29/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 10/29/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 11/14/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 11/14/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 11/18/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/19/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 11/26/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 12/04/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/06/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 12/06/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 12/17/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 12/17/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 12/18/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/08/2020
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 01/15/2020
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/15/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 01/24/2020
Del. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 02/21/2020
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/02/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/09/2020
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 03/12/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 08/25/2020
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 08/28/2020
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/04/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/04/2020
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/04/2020
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/04/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/04/2020
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/17/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/17/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 09/17/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2020
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 09/22/2020
Resident Commissioner Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 09/22/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 09/22/2020
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 11/27/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs05/01/2019 Referred to
07/23/2020 Hearings by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health05/15/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2435. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/01/2019)

Accelerating Veterans Recovery Outdoors Act

This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs to establish the Task Force on Outdoor Recreation for Veterans to report on and make recommendations regarding the use of public lands or other outdoor spaces for medical treatment and therapy for veterans.